Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abdallah Khoury

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia dei Maroniti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1872BornBkašin
4 Jun 189825.6Ordained PriestPriest
10 Feb 191138.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia dei Maroniti
12 Feb 191138.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia dei Maroniti
5 Feb 194976.2DiedTitular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia dei Maroniti

MicroData Summary for Abdallah Khoury:
Bishop Abdallah Khoury (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia dei Maroniti

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941, Page 320
  • op/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1950, Page 1,269
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1949, Page 416
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 64
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013