Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoine Abed

Deceased

Archbishop of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1896BornTripoli
17 May 192528.5Ordained PriestPriest of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Maronite)
23 Apr 193336.4SelectedBishop of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Maronite)
7 May 193336.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Maronite)
16 Oct 193336.9ConfirmedBishop of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Maronite)
5 Sep 196568.8AppointedArchbishop of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Maronite)
15 Sep 197578.8DiedArchbishop of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Maronite)

MicroData Summary for Antoine Abed:
Archbishop Antoine Abed (born , died ) Archbishop of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus}

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 42.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015