Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Akl

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Laodicea in Syria per i Maroniti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1883Born
22 Feb 191936.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Laodicea in Syria per i Maroniti
2 Mar 191936.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Laodicea in Syria per i Maroniti
19 Sep 195976.6DiedTitular Bishop of Laodicea in Syria per i Maroniti

MicroData Summary for Paul Akl
Bishop Paul Akl (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Laodicea in Syria per i Maroniti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceŠamat

  • a bishop for 40.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 218

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast