Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Murad

Deceased

Bishop of Baalbek (Maronite), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1854Born
12 Jun 189238.3AppointedBishop of Baalbek (Maronite), Lebanon
12 Jun 189238.3Ordained BishopBishop of Baalbek (Maronite), Lebanon
18 Apr 193783.2DiedBishop of Baalbek (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Murad
Bishop Giovanni Murad (born , died ) Bishop of Baalbek

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDlebta
Ordained BishopBkorki

  • a bishop for 44.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,892, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast