Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François Ayoub

Deceased

Archbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1899BornAleppo
16 May 192525.8Ordained PriestPriest
28 Nov 194243.4AppointedArchbishop of Cipro (Maronite), Cyprus
14 Feb 194343.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cipro (Maronite), Cyprus
16 Apr 195454.8AppointedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria
2 Jun 196666.9DiedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Maronite), Syria

MicroData Summary for François Ayoub:
Archbishop François Ayoub (born , died ) Archbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab]

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1943, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013