Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop František von Berchtold

Deceased

Bishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1730Born
21 Apr 175322.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Jun 175323.0Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jan 177645.5SelectedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
16 Sep 177646.2ConfirmedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
13 Oct 177646.3Ordained BishopBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
14 Aug 179363.1DiedBishop of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for František von Berchtold
Bishop František von Berchtold (born , died ) Bishop of Banská Bystrica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrnava

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 306
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,776, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast