Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Iligan

Dioecesis Iliganensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 15 November 1982
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Ozamis
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Philippines
  • Square Kilometers: 3,092 (1,194 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Diocesan Curia, P.O. Box 5572, Isabel Village, Palao, Iligan City, 9200 Lanao del Norte, Philippines
  • Telephone: (063)221-23-55
  • Fax: 221-6487

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Iligan
17 February 1971ErectedTerritorial Prelature of Iligan (erected)
20 November 1976Territory LostTerritorial Prelature of Iligan Territorial Prelature of Marawi (erected)
Diocese of Iligan
15 November 1982ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Iligan Diocese of Iligan

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Iligan
1980454,538585,10177.7%11112220,660224615ap1981
Diocese of Iligan
1990530,000700,00075.7%1782521,200154520ap1991
1999747,383863,58386.5%26194516,608294220ap2000
2000750,400985,30576.2%26164217,866244120ap2001
2001815,7321,133,10072.0%29184717,356295920ap2002
2002858,2941,140,57475.3%37205715,057215424ap2003
2003962,5101,261,60376.3%36235916,313245354ap2004
20041,010,6351,314,50776.9%35235817,424276826ap2005
20061,049,0001,364,00076.9%35144921,408426825ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.7, 29 Jan 2012; data: 11 Feb 2012