Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino Salvatore Re, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lipari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1883BornFavara
25 May 190723.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
11 Apr 192844.4AppointedBishop of Lipari, Italy
20 May 192844.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lipari, Italy
15 Jan 196379.2DiedBishop of Lipari, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Salvatore Re:
Bishop Bernardino Salvatore Re O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Lipari

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1928, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015