Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luciano Geraci

Deceased

Prelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy

Titular Bishop of Methone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1877Born
21 Dec 190124.6Ordained PriestPriest
6 Mar 193759.8AppointedPrelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy
6 Mar 193759.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Methone
23 May 193760.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Methone
20 Jul 194669.1DiedPrelate of Santa Lucia del Mela, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luciano Geraci
Bishop Luciano Geraci (born , died ) Prelate of Santa Lucia del Mela

EventPlace
Birth PlacePetralia Sottana

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1947
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast