Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Maria Lagumina

Deceased

Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1850Born
21 Dec 187222.4Ordained PriestPriest of Palermo, Italy
28 Nov 189848.3AppointedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
11 Dec 189848.4Ordained BishopBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy
5 May 193180.8DiedBishop of Agrigento (Girgenti), Italy

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Maria Lagumina (VIAF: 18536040)
Bishop Bartolomeo Maria Lagumina (born , died ) Bishop of Agrigento (Girgenti)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo, Archdiocese of Palermo
Ordained BishopCathedral, Palermo, Archdiocese of Palermo

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1932
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 82
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 41
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017