Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Bacchi

Deceased

Bishop of Faenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1854BornCastelfranco dell'Emilia
17 Mar 187823.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bologna, Italy
16 Oct 190652.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy
16 Oct 190652.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Myndus
18 Nov 190652.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myndus
2 Dec 191258.3AppointedBishop of Faenza, Italy
23 Jan 192469.5DiedBishop of Faenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Bacchi:
Bishop Vincenzo Bacchi (born , died ) Bishop of Faenza

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1925
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013