Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Próspero Maria Gustavo Bernardi, O.S.M. †

Deceased

Prelate of São Peregrino Laziosi no Alto Acre e Alto Purus

Titular Bishop of Paltus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1870BornBologna, Italy
19 May 189423.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friar Servants of Mary
15 Dec 191949.0AppointedPrelate of Acre e Purus, Brazil
15 Dec 191949.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Paltus
11 Jan 192049.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paltus
15 Aug 192049.7InstalledPrelate of Acre e Purus, Brazil
1 Feb 194473.1DiedPrelate of São Peregrino Laziosi no Alto Acre e Alto Purus, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Próspero Maria Gustavo Bernardi:
Bishop Próspero Maria Gustavo Bernardi O.S.M. (born , died ) Prelate of São Peregrino Laziosi no Alto Acre e Alto Purus

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013