Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emidio Trenta

Deceased

Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1860Born
19 May 188322.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
9 Dec 191050.1AppointedBishop of Larino, Italy
25 Mar 191150.4Ordained BishopBishop of Larino, Italy
17 Jul 191453.7AppointedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
2 Mar 194079.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
24 Jan 194281.2DiedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Emidio Trenta
Archbishop Emidio Trenta (born , died ) Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAscoli Piceno, Diocese of Ascoli Piceno

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941, Page 292
  • op/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast