Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François d’Andigné

Deceased

Bishop of Acqs (Dax), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1685¹Born
4 Apr 173348.2SelectedBishop of Acqs (Dax), France
2 Sep 173348.6ConfirmedBishop of Acqs (Dax), France
22 Nov 173348.8Ordained BishopBishop of Acqs (Dax), France
28 May 173651.4DiedBishop of Acqs (Dax), France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François d’Andigné
Bishop François d’Andigné (born 1685, died ) Bishop of Acqs (Dax)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAngers

  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 92
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1733, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast