Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander James Quinn

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cleveland, Ohio, USA

Titular Bishop of Socia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1932Born
24 May 195826.1Ordained PriestPriest of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
14 Oct 198351.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
14 Oct 198351.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Socia
5 Dec 198351.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Socia
14 Jun 200876.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Cleveland, Ohio, USA
18 Oct 201381.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cleveland, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Alexander James Quinn
Bishop Alexander James Quinn (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cleveland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCleveland

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Jun 2008
  • d: CB, 18 Oct 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Apr 2017