Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Michael Botean

Bishop of Saint George’s in Canton (Romanian), USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1955 Born
18 May 198630.8Ordained PriestPriest of Saint George’s in Canton (Romanian), USA
29 Mar 199640.7AppointedBishop of Saint George’s in Canton (Romanian), USA
24 Aug 199641.1Ordained BishopBishop of Saint George’s in Canton (Romanian), USA

MicroData Summary for John Michael Botean
Bishop John Michael Botean (born ) Bishop of Saint George’s in Canton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCanton, OH

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Saint George’s in Canton (Romanian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,782

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast