Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bruno Ruade

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Jun 1623AppointedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
10 Mar 1624Ordained BishopBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
2 Jan 1645DiedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France

MicroData Summary for Bruno Ruade
Bishop Bruno Ruade (died ) Bishop Emeritus of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans)

  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 160
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1624, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast