Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Kirwan

Deceased

Bishop of Killala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1589¹BornGalway
6 Feb 164556.0AppointedBishop of Killala, Ireland
7 May 164556.3Ordained BishopBishop of Killala, Ireland
26 Aug 166172.6DiedBishop of Killala, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francis Kirwan:
Bishop Francis Kirwan (died ) Bishop of Killala

  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 79
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015