Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis de Forbin d’Oppède

Deceased

Bishop of Toulon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1622Born
23 Jun 166441.6AppointedBishop of Toulon, France
28 Sep 166441.8Ordained BishopBishop of Toulon, France
29 Apr 167552.4DiedBishop of Toulon, France

MicroData Summary for Louis de Forbin d’Oppède
Bishop Louis de Forbin d’Oppède (born , died ) Bishop of Toulon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAix en Provence

  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: CB, 21 Dec 2013
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 339
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1664, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast