Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Adolfo Maria Astudillo Morales

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Los Ríos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1884BornCuenca
19 Dec 190824.4Ordained PriestPriest of Guayaquil, Ecuador
13 Aug 194864.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Los Ríos, Ecuador
1951¹66.4ResignedApostolic Administrator of Los Ríos, Ecuador
2 Apr 195772.7DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Los Ríos, Ecuador

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adolfo Maria Astudillo Morales:
Priest Adolfo Maria Astudillo Morales (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Los Ríos

  • a priest for 48.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951, Page 678

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013