Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marius Besson

Deceased

Bishop of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1876BornTorino, Italy
23 Jul 189923.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland
7 May 192043.8AppointedBishop of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland
13 Jun 192043.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lausanne et Genève, Switzerland
22 Feb 194568.6DiedBishop of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg), Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Marius Besson:
Bishop Marius Besson (born , died ) Bishop of Lausanne, Genève et Fribourg (Freiburg)

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015