Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ascanio Cardinal Filomarino

Deceased

Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1583²BornNaples
16 Dec 164159.0AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
16 Dec 164159.0Elevated to Cardinal
19 Jan 164259.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
10 Feb 164259.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Ara Coeli
3 Nov 166683.8DiedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ascanio Filomarino:
Cardinal Ascanio Filomarino (died ) Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

  • a bishop for 24.8 years
  • a cardinal for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Dec 1641
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 254
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 106, Number 644

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013