Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Benedetto Cardinal Ubaldi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Perugia

Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1588²BornPerugia
28 Nov 163345.9Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jan 163446.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
2 Apr 163446.2AppointedBishop of Perugia, Italy
23 Apr 163446.3Ordained BishopBishop of Perugia, Italy
14 Dec 164355.9ResignedBishop of Perugia, Italy
18 Jan 164456.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Perugia, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Ubaldi:
Benedetto Cardinal Ubaldi (born 1588, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Perugia

  • a bishop for 9.7 years
  • a cardinal for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 Nov 1633
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 24, and Page 277
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 94, Number 562
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1634, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015