Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Casimir Plagens

Deceased

Bishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1880BornCzeszewo, Poland
5 Jul 190323.4Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
22 May 192444.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
22 May 192444.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhodiapolis
30 Sep 192444.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhodiapolis
13 Nov 193555.8AppointedBishop of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette, Michigan, USA
29 Jan 193656.0InstalledBishop of Sault Sainte Marie and Marquette, Michigan, USA
14 Dec 194060.9AppointedBishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
18 Feb 194161.1InstalledBishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
31 Mar 194363.2DiedBishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Casimir Plagens:
Bishop Joseph Casimir Plagens (born , died ) Bishop of Grand Rapids

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Website of the Diocese, 14 Jun 2011
  • b: CB, 14 Jun 2011
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013