Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Calvó y Martí, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of El Beni o Beni

Titular Bishop of Cotenna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1862BornTarragona, Spain
6 Dec 188826.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
13 Aug 191957.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of El Beni o Beni, Bolivia
13 Aug 191957.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Cotenna
9 Nov 191957.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cotenna
5 Mar 192664.0DiedVicar Apostolic of El Beni o Beni, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Ramón Calvó y Martí:
Bishop Ramón Calvó y Martí O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of El Beni o Beni

  • a priest for 37.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013