Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Frédéric Saivet

Deceased

Bishop of Perpignan-Elne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1828BornLectoure
5 Oct 185123.1Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 187244.4SelectedBishop of Mende, France
21 Mar 187344.6ConfirmedBishop of Mende, France
11 May 187344.7Ordained BishopBishop of Mende, France
19 Mar 187647.6SelectedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
26 Jun 187647.9ConfirmedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
30 Jun 187748.9DiedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Frédéric Saivet:
Bishop Joseph-Frédéric Saivet (born , died ) Bishop of Perpignan-Elne

  • a priest for 25.7 years
  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 258, and Page 385

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013