Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Chenis, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Civitavecchia-Tarquinia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Apr 1954BornTorino
8 Sep 197117.4ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
26 May 198430.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
21 Dec 200652.7AppointedBishop of Civitavecchia-Tarquinia, Italy
10 Feb 200752.8Ordained BishopBishop of Civitavecchia-Tarquinia, Italy
24 Feb 200752.8InstalledBishop of Civitavecchia-Tarquinia, Italy
19 Mar 201055.9DiedBishop of Civitavecchia-Tarquinia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Chenis:
Bishop Carlo Chenis S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Civitavecchia-Tarquinia

  • a priest for 25.8 years
  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,337
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013