Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christopher John Glancy, C.S.V.

Auxiliary Bishop of Belize City-Belmopan, Belize

Titular Bishop of Absa Salla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1960 BornMoline, IL, USA
16 Jul 198323.3ProfessedMember of Clerics of Saint Viator
13 Jul 198626.3Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Clerics of Saint Viator
17 Apr 199333.0Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics of Saint Viator
18 Feb 201251.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Belize City-Belmopan, Belize, Antilles
18 Feb 201251.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Absa Salla
5 May 201252.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Absa Salla

MicroData Summary for Christopher John Glancy:
Bishop Christopher John Glancy C.S.V. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Belize City-Belmopan

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Belize City-Belmopan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2012
  • ob: CB, 24 Feb 2012
  • c2+: CB, 13 Mar 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,431

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013