Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Santiago Pérez Sánchez

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Caroní

Titular Bishop of Castellum Medianum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1942BornTurcia
18 Feb 196725.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 May 199351.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Caroní, Venezuela
28 May 199351.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Castellum Medianum
17 Sep 199351.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castellum Medianum
2 Jul 199452.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Caroní, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Santiago Pérez Sánchez:
Bishop Santiago Pérez Sánchez (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Caroní

  • a priest for 27.4 years
  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,171
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013