Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sebastiano Fraghí

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Oristano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1903Born
29 Jul 192825.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 194744.1AppointedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
8 Dec 194744.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
14 Dec 197875.4RetiredArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
22 Jul 198582.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Oristano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sebastiano Fraghí
Archbishop Sebastiano Fraghí (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Oristano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOzieri

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 37.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 127

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast