Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Jammu-Srinagar

Dioecesis Iammuensis-Srinagarensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 10 March 1986
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Delhi
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 222,236 (85,838 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.jammusrinagardio.org/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, Jammu Cantt. 180003, Jammu and Kashmir State, India
  • Telephone: (0191)2430.083
  • Fax: 2454.325

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Kashmir and Jammu
17 January 1952ErectedDiocese of Lahore
Diocese of Rawalpindi
Prefecture Apostolic of Kashmir and Jammu (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Jammu and Kashmir
4 May 1968Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Kashmir and Jammu Prefecture Apostolic of Jammu and Kashmir
Diocese of Jammu-Srinagar
10 March 1986ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Jammu and Kashmir Diocese of Jammu-Srinagar

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Jammu and Kashmir
19702,4503,560,976.1%10102451042ap1971
19802,2745,027,000.0%213151511455ap1981
Diocese of Jammu-Srinagar
19905,6006,363,500.1%517222542110829ap1991
199914,6009,200,000.2%19284731013218229ap2000
200015,0219,200,000.2%21234434112717429ap2001
200115,2009,300,000.2%23285129813218234ap2002
200215,4549,400,000.2%24204435112019838ap2003
200315,87510,069,917.2%25204535212020038ap2004
200416,00010,075,000.2%28204833312018038ap2005
200616,26010,130,000.2%30134337811318528ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011