Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Patrick Roger Foley

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA

Titular Bishop of Pergamum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1822Born
16 Aug 184624.4Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
19 Nov 186947.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
19 Nov 186947.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Pergamum
27 Feb 187047.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pergamum
10 Mar 187048.0InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA
19 Feb 187956.9DiedCoadjutor Bishop of Chicago, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Patrick Roger Foley
Bishop Thomas Patrick Roger Foley (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop of Chicago

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, Baltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland
Death PlaceChicago, Diocese of Chicago, Illinois

  • a priest for 32.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 200, and Page 447
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Feb 2017