Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Nicanor Peña Rodríguez

Bishop Emeritus of Nuestra Señora de la Altagracia en Higüey, Dominican Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1942 Born
22 Jun 196826.2Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de los Caballeros, Dominican Republic
16 Dec 199654.7AppointedBishop of Puerto Plata, Dominican Republic
25 Jan 199754.8Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Plata, Dominican Republic
24 Jun 200462.2AppointedBishop of Nuestra Señora de la Altagracia en Higüey, Dominican Republic
21 Aug 200462.4InstalledBishop of Nuestra Señora de la Altagracia en Higüey, Dominican Republic
30 May 202078.2RetiredBishop of Nuestra Señora de la Altagracia en Higüey, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Nicanor Peña Rodríguez
Bishop Gregorio Nicanor Peña Rodríguez (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Nuestra Señora de la Altagracia en Higüey

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaitoa
Ordained BishopEstadio José Briceño, Puerto Plata, Diocese of Puerto Plata

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nuestra Señora de la Altagracia en Higüey.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,911
  • r: Bollettino, 30 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast