Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Giachetti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pinerolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1922BornCastelnuovo Nigra
29 Jun 194623.8Ordained PriestPriest
1 May 197653.6AppointedBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
29 Jun 197653.8Ordained BishopBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
7 Jul 199875.8RetiredBishop of Pinerolo, Italy
6 Aug 200683.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Pinerolo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Giachetti:
Bishop Pietro Giachetti (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pinerolo

  • a priest for 60.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013