Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tibor Boromisza

Deceased

Bishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1840Born
18 Jul 186323.0Ordained PriestPriest
3 Aug 190666.0AppointedBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
30 Sep 190666.1Ordained BishopBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania
9 Jul 192887.9DiedBishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}, Romania

MicroData Summary for Tibor Boromisza
Bishop Tibor Boromisza (born , died ) Bishop of Satu Mare {Szatmár}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKalocsa

  • a priest for 64.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1906, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast