Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Pacifico

Deceased

Bishop of Teano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1635Born
4 Jan 167135.2Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jan 169862.2AppointedBishop of Teano, Italy
2 Feb 169862.2Ordained BishopBishop of Teano, Italy
Sep 1717³81.8DiedBishop of Teano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Pacifico
Bishop Domenico Pacifico (born , died Sep 1717) Bishop of Teano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAversa

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 373
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1698, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast