Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Grassi

Deceased

Bishop of Chioggia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1644BornChioggia
18 Dec 166622.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
4 Jun 166722.8Ordained PriestPriest
21 May 169651.8AppointedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
3 Jun 169651.8Ordained BishopBishop of Chioggia, Italy
4 Nov 171571.3DiedBishop of Chioggia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Grassi:
Bishop Antonio Grassi (born , died ) Bishop of Chioggia

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 161
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015