Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bisanzio Fili

Deceased

Bishop of Ostuni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1656³BornAltamura
15 Jun 168024.1Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jan 169841.7AppointedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
2 Feb 169841.7Ordained BishopBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
11 Apr 170750.9AppointedBishop of Ostuni, Italy
Apr 1720³63.9DiedBishop of Ostuni, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bisanzio Fili:
Bishop Bisanzio Fili (born , died Apr 1720) Bishop of Ostuni

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 297, and Page 299
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1698, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 3 May 2015