Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ulisse Giuseppe Cardinal Gozzadini

Deceased

Bishop of Imola

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1650BornBologna
8 Sep 170049.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Teodosia
12 Sep 170049.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Teodosia
15 Apr 170958.5Elevated to Cardinal
19 Jun 170958.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
19 Feb 171059.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Imola, Italy
20 Mar 172877.4DiedBishop of Imola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ulisse Giuseppe Gozzadini:
Cardinal Ulisse Giuseppe Gozzadini (born , died ) Bishop of Imola

  • a bishop for 27.5 years
  • a cardinal for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Apr 1709

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013