Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Matteo Marchetti

Deceased

Bishop of Arezzo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1647³BornPistoia
19 Dec 169144.8AppointedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
30 Dec 169144.8Ordained BishopBishop of Arezzo, Italy
Sep 1704³57.5DiedBishop of Arezzo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Matteo Marchetti:
Bishop Giovanni Matteo Marchetti (born , died Sep 1704) Bishop of Arezzo

  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 98
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1691, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 26 Apr 2015