Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop NicolÚ Nardini

Deceased

Bishop of Acquapendente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1636BornCapranica
26 Dec 167842.4Ordained PriestPriest
21 May 169659.8AppointedBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
3 Jun 169659.9Ordained BishopBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
Jul 1697³60.9DiedBishop of Acquapendente, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for NicolÚ Nardini:
Bishop NicolÚ Nardini (born , died Jul 1697) Bishop of Acquapendente

  • a priest for 18.5 years
  • a bishop for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 92
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1696, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015