Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Prudencio Padilla Andaya, Jr., C.I.C.M.

Vicar Apostolic of Tabuk, Philippines

Titular Bishop of Fuerteventura

Apostolic Administrator of Ilagan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1959 Born
8 Dec 198627.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
16 Apr 200344.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tabuk, Philippines
16 Apr 200344.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Fuerteventura
16 Jul 200344.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fuerteventura
25 Feb 201758.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ilagan, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Prudencio Padilla Andaya, Jr.
Bishop Prudencio Padilla Andaya, Jr. C.I.C.M. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Tabuk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLubuagan

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Tabuk.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,424
  • ab: CB, 6 Jun 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 7 Jun 2017