Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Riegler, M.F.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lydenburg, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1901Born
192321.0ProfessedMember of Missionaries of the Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
29 Jun 192624.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
30 Jun 193937.5AppointedPrefect of Lydenburg, South Africa
9 Dec 194847.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Bita
9 Dec 194847.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Lydenburg, South Africa
23 Jan 194947.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bita
11 Jan 195149.1AppointedBishop of Lydenburg, South Africa
6 Oct 195553.8DiedBishop of Lydenburg, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Johannes Riegler
Bishop Johannes Riegler M.F.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop of Lydenburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceÜbersbach, Austria

  • a priest for 29.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast