Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Clement Van Hoeck, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Pietersburg, South Africa

Titular Bishop of Cissita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1903Born
30 Oct 192724.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
6 Jan 195450.5AppointedAbbot of Pietersburg, South Africa
6 Jan 195450.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Cissita
1 May 195450.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cissita
29 Nov 197471.4ResignedAbbot of Pietersburg, South Africa
20 Apr 197672.8DiedAbbot Emeritus of Pietersburg, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Francis Clement Van Hoeck
Bishop Francis Clement Van Hoeck O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Pietersburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGent, Belgium

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast