Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Polokwane

Dioecesis Polokwanensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 4 September 2009
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Pretoria
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: South Africa
  • Square Kilometers: 69,533 (26,857 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: 8 Compensatie Str., P.O. Box 166, Pietersburg 0700, South Africa
  • Telephone: (015)295.81.52

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Northern Transvaal {Transvaal Settentrionale}
22 December 1910ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Transvaal Prefecture Apostolic of Northern Transvaal {Transvaal Settentrionale} (erected)
Territorial Abbey of Pietersburg
13 June 1939ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Northern Transvaal {Transvaal Settentrionale} Territorial Abbey of Pietersburg
27 December 1962Territory LostTerritorial Abbey of Pietersburg Prefecture Apostolic of Louis Trichardt (erected)
Diocese of Pietersburg
15 December 1988ElevatedTerritorial Abbey of Pietersburg Diocese of Pietersburg
Diocese of Polokwane
4 September 2009Name ChangedDiocese of Pietersburg Diocese of Polokwane

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Abbey of Pietersburg
195013,848118197282810010ap1951
197043,917650,0006.8%620261,68925197ap1971
198072,237839,0008.6%616223,28313345710ap1981
Diocese of Pietersburg
1990108,133910,00011.9%1012224,91510245726ap1991
1999105,9822,000,0005.3%1212244,4159285520ap2000
200095,1252,000,0004.8%119204,7569234718ap2001
200196,3112,000,0004.8%127195,0699144613ap2002
200298,2792,500,0003.9%1115263,7799324826ap2003
200396,7722,500,0003.9%1416303,22510254513ap2004
200486,2682,500,0003.5%185233,7508144412ap2005
Diocese of Polokwane
201093,5002,624,0003.6%217283,3397124013ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 8 Sep 2013