Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony Okonkwo Gbuji

Bishop Emeritus of Enugu, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1931 Born
23 Nov 195827.0Ordained PriestPriest of Issele-Uku, Nigeria
5 Jul 197341.6AppointedBishop of Issele-Uku, Nigeria
30 Sep 197341.9Ordained BishopBishop of Issele-Uku, Nigeria
8 Nov 199665.0AppointedBishop of Enugu, Nigeria
9 Feb 200977.2RetiredBishop of Enugu, Nigeria
31 May 201078.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Benin City, Nigeria
18 Mar 201179.3CeasedApostolic Administrator of Benin City, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Anthony Okonkwo Gbuji
Bishop Anthony Okonkwo Gbuji (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Enugu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUbulu-Uku

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Enugu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Feb 2009
  • ab: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018