Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop João Bosco Oliver de Faria

Archbishop Emeritus of Diamantina, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1939 BornSão João del Rei
3 Jul 196828.6Ordained PriestPriest of Pouso Alegre, Minas Gerais, Brazil
5 Aug 198747.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pouso Alegre, Minas Gerais, Brazil
5 Aug 198747.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Feradi Maius
12 Oct 198747.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Feradi Maius
8 Jan 199252.1AppointedBishop of Patos de Minas, Minas Gerais, Brazil
22 Feb 199252.3InstalledBishop of Patos de Minas, Minas Gerais, Brazil
30 May 200767.5AppointedArchbishop of Diamantina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
9 Mar 201676.3RetiredArchbishop of Diamantina, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João Bosco Oliver de Faria
Archbishop João Bosco Oliver de Faria (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Diamantina

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Diamantina.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 May 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,907
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 9 Mar 2016