Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Cornelius O’Riley

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}, South Africa

Titular Bishop of Phoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1868Born
1 Nov 189022.7Ordained PriestPriest of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}, South Africa
15 Jul 192557.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}, South Africa
15 Jul 192557.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Phoba
6 Jan 192657.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Phoba
6 Jun 193264.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}, South Africa
28 Jul 195688.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Bernard Cornelius O’Riley
Bishop Bernard Cornelius O’Riley (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCape Town, Vicariate Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}
Ordained BishopSt. Mary's, Cape Town, Vicariate Apostolic of Cape of Good Hope, Western District {Capo di Buona Speranza, Distretto Occidentale}

  • a priest for 65.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1,926, Number 3
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 26, Number 1,466

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast