Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis Kelly

Deceased

Bishop of Ross, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jan 1852Born
1877²24.9Ordained PriestPriest
29 Mar 189745.2AppointedBishop of Ross, Ireland
9 May 189745.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ross, Ireland
18 Apr 192472.2DiedBishop of Ross, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Denis Kelly
Bishop Denis Kelly (born , died ) Bishop of Ross

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNenagh, Co. Tipperary, Archdiocese of Cashel (-Emly)
Ordained BishopSkibbereen

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 486
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017