Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Obafemi Adesina

Bishop of Ijebu-Ode, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1964 Born
14 Oct 198925.7Ordained PriestPriest of Oyo, Nigeria
3 Mar 199531.0IncardinatedPriest of Osogbo, Nigeria
17 Jan 201954.9AppointedBishop of Ijebu-Ode, Nigeria
25 Apr 201955.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ijebu-Ode, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Francis Obafemi Adesina
Bishop Francis Obafemi Adesina (born ) Bishop of Ijebu-Ode

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWenchi, Ghana
Ordained BishopOutdoors, St. Anthony’s Nursery & Primary School, Ijebu-Ode, Diocese of Ijebu-Ode

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ijebu-Ode.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Jan 2019
  • ob: CB, 9 Feb 2019
  • c2: CB, 6 Apr 2019
  • c2+: CB, 25 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 26 Apr 2019

Quantcast